Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
The County Of Brazos, Texas, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Treadway, Keith, against Fisher, Deborah Kay, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Brick, John presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryTax Cases |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SHERIFF'S RETURN ON ORDER OF SALE | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | ISSUE ORDER OF SALE | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Order of Sale | |
March 31, 2023 | Docket Event | Tax Suit | |
October 25, 2022 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
October 04, 2022 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Tax Suit | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF LAST KNOWN ADDRESS | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED TAX AFFIDAVIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.