Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Bull, Edward C filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Cardoso Suarez, Marcel, represented by Hilburn, David, Klepper, Jim C., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLocke, Jim Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 30, 2020 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 24, 2021 | Docket Event | COLLECTION RECEIPT | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT AND SENTENCE | |
January 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Bench Trial | |
January 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Applications for Subpoena | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Plea Deadline | |
November 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
September 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
September 04, 2020 | Docket Event | LETTER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.