Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Connick, Gretchen O. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Purvis, Joseph Ethan, represented by Price, I. Richard, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 20, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Plea | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | Plea Paper Packet | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Plea | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
June 27, 2022 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | Status of Attorney | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
November 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.