Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rogers, Terry Dewayne, Jr, represented by Garrett, John Reilly, Shaw, Shelly Megan, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Matzke, Amanda presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 25, 2020 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Order to Issue Capias Pro Fine | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | MT FOR COURT APPOINTED ATTORNEY'S FEES/APPROVAL | |
December 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea Paper Packet | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Plea | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
October 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Request to Reset | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.