Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Culver, Jacqualyn Ann filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Matzke, Amanda presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatzke, Amanda Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 11, 2021 |
CategoryLetters Of Testamentary |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Affdt. in Lieu of Inv. Appraisement & List of Claims (OCA) | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF | |
September 23, 2021 | Docket Event | PROOF OF PUBLICATION | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | TESTIMONY | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | OATH | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ADMITTING WILL | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | ANSWERS AND RESPONSES | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Letters Testamentary | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | WILL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.