Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Bruno, Ricky Imon, represented by Phelps, Shane, Wilkinson, Sarah Bennett, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts 85th District Court with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHawthorne, Kyle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 2018 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House85th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 23, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion to Withdraw Attorney | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE | |
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY | |
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Warrant Served - OCA | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued-OCA | |
June 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.