Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hammond, Andres Curtis, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Bryan, Travis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | ST Incident Report | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT/RELEASE ORDER | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
June 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Fingerprint Document | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Plea | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
June 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
June 07, 2019 | Docket Event | Docket Call |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.