Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Vicari, Joshua Eid-Thomas, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Swan, Misty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | PROSECUTION BARRED | |
April 04, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
April 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
April 02, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | TRANSFERED CASE TO 272 DISTRICT COURT | |
March 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.