Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ellis, Tremelia Gay, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
July 15, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Status of Compliance | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
March 15, 2019 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
March 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
March 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
December 04, 2018 | Docket Event | REQUEST | |
November 28, 2018 | Docket Event | Status/Plea |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.