Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Young, Gerren Keith, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts 361st District Court with Swan, Misty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House361st District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL CAPIAS | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | CHANGE OF ADDRESS | |
September 30, 2020 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND JUDICIAL CONFESSION | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT RIGHT OF APPEAL | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Discovery | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | PLEA PAPERS/AGREEMENT | |
April 17, 2018 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT/RELEASE ORDER | |
April 06, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
April 05, 2018 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.