Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hedge, Michael Jerome, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts 85th District Court with Hawthorne, Kyle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Filing Court House85th District Court |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | Agreed Discovery | |
November 20, 2018 | Docket Event | PROSECUTION BARRED | |
November 19, 2018 | Docket Event | Final Pretrial | |
October 29, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
June 27, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
May 23, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
April 20, 2018 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF ARRAIGNMENT | |
April 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment/Pretrial | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY | |
March 05, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.