Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gourley, David Raymond, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Swan, Misty presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Felony |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 12, 2018 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
November 02, 2018 | Docket Event | PROSECUTION BARRED | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
November 01, 2018 | Docket Event | PROSECUTION BARRED | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
October 30, 2018 | Docket Event | Other | |
October 10, 2018 | Docket Event | Arraignment/Pretrial | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | PRECEPT | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Precept to Serve | |
December 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Indictment (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.