Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Rios, Jesus Antonio, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2017 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CAPIAS SERVED | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Admonitions | |
February 01, 2019 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT RIGHT OF APPEAL | |
January 24, 2019 | Docket Event | JAIL ORDER | |
January 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Status/Plea | |
December 31, 2018 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY LETTER OF REPRESENTATION | |
December 28, 2018 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
December 27, 2018 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.