Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Motion To Adjudicate Guilt case against Purnell, Rachel Meraiah, represented by Shimek, Bruno A., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2015 |
CategoryMotion To Adjudicate Guilt |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Physical File Documents | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S REPORT | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | JAIL ORDER | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT RIGHT OF APPEAL | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
August 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Other | |
June 28, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion to Revoke/Proceed Hearing | |
June 01, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
May 24, 2017 | Docket Event | Plea Conference |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.