Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bailey, Brenda filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Forschnier, Thomas Joseph, represented by Thibodeaux, Lane D., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Final Physical File Documents | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 21, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | JAIL ORDER | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ASSOCIATE JUDGE'S REPORT | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | OTHER | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ||
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR RESTITUTION | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT RIGHT OF APPEAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.