Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gantt, Candice Shermaine, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with McCleary, Mike presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2018 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Active (OCA) | |
May 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAID FINE | |
August 04, 2020 | Docket Event | Scanned Case | |
February 10, 2020 | Docket Event | TEL-CALL | |
August 27, 2019 | Docket Event | Sent to OMNI | |
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Warrant Issued-OCA | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Show Cause Hearing (OCA) | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | SHOW CAUSE ISSUED | |
January 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Deferred Disposition | |
January 08, 2019 | Docket Event | DPS Citation and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.