Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bailey, Brenda filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Moore, Joshua Patrick, represented by Greaves, Craig, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZachary, Dana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2009 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER DISCHARGING DEFENDANT FROM COMMUNITY SUPERVISION | |
June 11, 2012 | Docket Event | ORDER RELEASING INTERLOCK DEVICE | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | OTHER | |
November 09, 2011 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE SERVED | |
November 01, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL CAPIAS | |
April 14, 2011 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
June 28, 2010 | Docket Event | IGNITION INTERLOCK ORDER | |
June 03, 2010 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | WAIVER OF RIGHTS AND PLEA OF GUILTY | |
May 28, 2010 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.