Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Greg Frank D B A Prism Medical & Surgical, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Peterson, Christopher W., against Orthopedic Solutions, L.L.C., Texas Ortho Source, L.L.C., Psi Premier Specialties, Inc., Medical Express, Inc., Top Brace & Limb, Inc., (total of 5) See All represented by Lockwood, Michael G, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Bryan, Travis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBryan, Travis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event | FAX (INCLUDING LETTER, VARIOUS INSTRUMENTS, ETC.) | |
February 21, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
February 18, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICES OF NONSUITS | |
February 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
February 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Default Judgment | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | DEFAULT JUDGMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.