Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mattern, James, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Dillard, Jack W., against Hartman, Kenneth Wade, Graham, Austin, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Langley, JD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLangley, JD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2009 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2012 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
March 26, 2012 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF NON-SUIT | |
March 23, 2012 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
March 14, 2012 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
February 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
August 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Pull | |
July 29, 2011 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
July 21, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.