Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Anderson, Rodney W. filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Carlin, Brandon Domingo, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Locke, Jim presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | MOTION | |
July 09, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
June 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 13, 2010 | Docket Event | ORDER DISCHARGING DEFENDANT FROM COMMUNITY SUPERVISION | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR DEFERRED ADJUDICATION SIGNED | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.