Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Williams, Rundar, represented by Gimbert, Louis, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Bryan, Travis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
February 25, 2015 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE RECALLED | |
May 06, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL CAPIAS | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
July 31, 2009 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT/RELEASE ORDER | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND JUDICIAL CONFESSION | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
July 21, 2009 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT ACCEPTED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.