Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Comte, Kara filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Ball, Chad Aaron, represented by Lewis, Neeley C., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND JUDICIAL CONFESSION | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT ACCEPTED | |
April 29, 2009 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
April 21, 2009 | Docket Event | COMMUNITY SERVICE | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S REPORT | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Status of Attorney | |
February 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.