Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Hilburn, David filed a(n) case against Robertson, Fredrick Vonsha, Jr, represented by Davis, Richard W.B., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2008 |
Last RefreshedDecember 15, 2021 |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S REPORT | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
May 28, 2009 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND JUDICIAL CONFESSION | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT/RELEASE ORDER | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT ACCEPTED | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION | |
May 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
May 12, 2009 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
April 17, 2009 | Docket Event | Status of Attorney | |
April 15, 2009 | Docket Event | SETTING REQUEST |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.