Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Comte, Kara filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Jackson, Lakisha Nicole, represented by Granberry, Jay, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Bryan, Travis presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryAdult Misdemeanor |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2013 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE SERVED | |
January 26, 2012 | Docket Event | WARNING BY MAGISTRATE | |
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE ISSUED | |
January 09, 2012 | Docket Event | SETTING REQUEST | |
April 13, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
April 06, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT ACCEPTED | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT OF CONVICTION | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | RETENTION | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | COMMITMENT/RELEASE ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.