Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Motion To Adjudicate Guilt case against Buerger, Colton Lee, represented by Greaves, Craig, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeZachary, Dana Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryMotion To Adjudicate Guilt |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | JAIL ORDER | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER REVOKING PROBATION | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | TRIAL COURT CERTIFICATION OF DEFENDANT RIGHT OF APPEAL | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | Waiver of Rights | |
June 06, 2011 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AND JUDICIAL CONFESSION | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
June 01, 2011 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
April 12, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
April 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.