Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Johnson, Donna, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Nance, Joseph H., against Hajjali, Glena Individualy And D B A Aggieland Auto Sales, Sweidan, Marwan Hussein Individually And D B A Aggieland Auto Sales, represented by Banks, Philip C., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Langley, JD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2008 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2011 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
May 24, 2011 | Docket Event | BILL OF COST | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | ORDER | |
February 17, 2011 | Docket Event | Submission | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion for New Trial | |
January 20, 2011 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO MOTION (MISC. MOTIONS) | |
January 11, 2011 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
January 05, 2011 | Docket Event | Submission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.