Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
State Of Texas filed a(n) Motion To Revoke Misd. case against Stewart, Joyia Levette, in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Zachary, Dana presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2002 |
CategoryMotion To Revoke Misd. |
Last RefreshedDecember 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2018 | Docket Event | CAPIAS SERVED | |
June 24, 2016 | Docket Event | CAPIAS PRO FINE RECALLED | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER TO RECALL CAPIAS | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF APPOINTING AN ATTORNEY | |
February 11, 2010 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S REPORT | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | WARRANT REQUEST | |
February 05, 2010 | Docket Event | CAPIAS SERVED | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
June 22, 2009 | Docket Event | PAYMENT EXTENSION AGREEMENT | |
March 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Bond |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.