Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Pedraza, Enedina, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Galvez, Jason C., against Hays Brothers Painting Service, Mayo, James M., represented by Kissner, Todd A., in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Langley, JD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2002 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 17, 2009 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) | |
September 28, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENTION TO TAKE DEPO BY WRITTEN QUEST. | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF JUDGMENT AS TO RULE 306A | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
June 17, 2005 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING | |
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event | $DISP | |
June 16, 2005 | Docket Event | Status Hearing | |
June 14, 2005 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 26, 2005 | Docket Event | FAX (INCLUDING LETTER, VARIOUS INSTRUMENTS, ETC.) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.