Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bishara, Mark, filed a(n) Civil Case - Other case represented by Bishara, Roger E., against Web Con, Inc., Martin, Frederick Herbert, Ii, Martin, Carlton Foster, Colby, Matthew C., Mcdondald, Brian Michael, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Brazos County, TX, . Brazos County, TX Superior Courts with Davis, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 11, 2002 |
CategoryCivil Case - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazos County, TX |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 28, 2007 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT DESTRUCTION LETTER | |
December 20, 2007 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT DESTRUCTION LETTER | |
December 10, 2007 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
July 21, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
July 06, 2006 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL MISC. | |
June 28, 2006 | Docket Event | LETTER FOR THE FILE | |
August 17, 2005 | Docket Event | ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT | |
June 07, 2005 | Docket Event | Jury Trial | |
May 17, 2005 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT | |
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event | RETENTION (DESTROY DATE) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.