Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mosauer, Dolores C., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by Jeffrey R. Gilbert, against Ramirez, Javier, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 01, 2018 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion for Summary Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
December 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 11, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Docket Call (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
October 12, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Passed CANCELED Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) Passed |
|
September 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
August 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Jury Docket Call (1:45 PM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.