Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sterling Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Noelle G. Hicks, against Stell, Jason Jeremiah, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Terri T. Holder presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTerri T. Holder Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 11, 2018 |
CategoryContract - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holder, Terri) | |
February 08, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holder, Terri) | |
December 29, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
December 22, 2020 | Docket Event | Motion | |
December 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Response | |
December 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.