Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Angleton-Danbury Hospital District, Angleton Drainage District, Angleton Independent School District, Brazoria County, Brazoria County Emergency Service District #3, (total of 7) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael J. Darlow, against Shell, Donnie W., Shell, William B., Jr., in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2015 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Release | |
June 02, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
May 22, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Statement | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.