Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Mcdaniel, Brittany Nicole, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mcdaniel, Johnny Kyle, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 29, 2015 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Uncontested (8:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
September 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
September 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Report | |
May 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Temporary Restraining Order Passed CANCELED Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officers Hufstetler, K. Randall, Warren, Jeremy) Passed |
|
March 07, 2016 | Docket Event | Citation/TRO McDaniel, Johnny Kyle Unserved | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Request | |
March 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Family (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.