Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sterling Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clinton F. Brown, against Benjamin, Taft, Iii, Benjamin, Kendra, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeNonsuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
September 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Show Cause (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Denman, W. Edwin) | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
September 16, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Suggestion of Bankruptcy | |
August 03, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Case Information Sheet | |
December 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.