Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Sterling Lakes Property Owners Association, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Clinton F. Brown, against Brailey, Angelic, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Terri T. Holder presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2015 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Holder, Terri) | |
August 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
December 29, 2015 | Docket Event | Citation Brailey, Angelic Served 01/16/2016 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.