Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Llanes, Veronica Sue, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Llanes, Johnnie Richard, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2015 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce No Children |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
July 03, 2018 | Docket Event | Report | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Rule 11 Agreement | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
June 05, 2018 | Docket Event | Dismissal for Want of Prosecution (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 03/16/2018 Reset by Court to 06/05/2018 | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice | |
March 08, 2018 | Docket Event | Mail Return |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.