Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alvin Community College District, Alvin Independent School District, Brazoria County, Brazoria County Conservation & Reclamation District #3, Brazoria County Emergency Service District #3, (total of 6) See All filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Michael J. Darlow, against All Unknown Heirs Of Mary Jeanine Applegate, Applegate, John A., Applegate, Mary Jeanine, represented by Michelle A. Stover, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2015 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 27, 2017 | Docket Event | Proposed Order | |
May 19, 2017 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
March 29, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Secretary of State Certificate | |
November 23, 2016 | Docket Event | Secretary of State Certificate | |
November 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Petition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.