Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Callis, Jason Michael, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Eric T. Furey, against Richards, Perry J., Richards, Ouida Rene, represented by Douglas V. Colvin, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2014 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Case Outcome TypeFinal Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
July 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
May 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
May 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify (Civil) | |
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify (Civil) | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice | |
April 05, 2019 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
November 26, 2018 | Docket Event | Proposed Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.