Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Werres, Karen Lynn, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Charles Pelowski, against Werres, Kenneth Joseph, represented by Christine A. Polansky, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeConsolidated |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 08, 2019 | Docket Event | Memo | |
July 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
July 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
June 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
May 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Answer | |
April 24, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Designation | |
April 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.