Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ideal Decor, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael G. Martinez, against Dishroon, Carr, Capps, Kenneth, Breitbeil, Karen, represented by Lilly Thrower King, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2014 |
CategoryContract - Other |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDismissed |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice | |
December 10, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Submission (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hardin, Ben) | |
November 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion | |
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion Hearing (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hardin, Ben) | |
October 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Response | |
October 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
September 28, 2015 | Docket Event | Motion to Strike (10:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Hardin, Ben) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.