Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts 461st District Court with Joe Patrick Bulanek presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJoe Patrick Bulanek Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2024 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedApril 08, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House461st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:30 PM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Response | |
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Counter Petition | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned - Served | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation/TRO Reyna, Fhillip Sherman Served 03/26/2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.