Case Last Refreshed: 6 days ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts 461st District Court with Joe Patrick Bulanek presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 14, 2024 |
CategoryParent-Child Relationship - No Divorce |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Filing Court House461st District Court |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Default Judgment - Mailed | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Bailiff's Response | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Order In Suit Affecting The Parent-Child Relationship | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Certificate of Last Known Mailing Address | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Military Status Affidavit | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
April 23, 2024 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | Service Returned - Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.