Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
filed a(n) Pcr - Custody/Visitation case in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts 461st District Court with Joe Patrick Bulanek presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2024 |
CategoryPcr - Custody/Visitation |
Last RefreshedApril 15, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Filing Court House461st District Court |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) 03/26/2024 Reset by Court to 04/10/2024 | |
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | TRestraining Order Alford, Madison Unserved | |
March 27, 2024 | Docket Event | Process Request Form | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Order Extending Temporary Restraining Order | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Bulanek, Patrick) | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Citation Alford, Madison Unserved | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Family (OCA) | |
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.