Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sombrero Property Tax Fund I Llc, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case represented by Yanira Marie Reyes, against Aqua Finance, Inc., Brazoria County, Brazoria County Emergency Service District #1, Brazoria County Emergency Service District #2, City Of West Columbia, (total of 11) See All represented by Alamdar S Hamdani, Michael J. Darlow, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2023 |
CategoryTax Case |
Last RefreshedNovember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Case Outcome TypeDefault Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Non-Jury Trial (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
October 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit | |
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice | |
August 22, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.