Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Midtown At Magnolia, filed a(n) Real Property - Other case represented by M Susan Rice, against Shihabuddin, Zahra, Nanto, Belighan Darack, Molina, Rosendo, Ajala, Chitra, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Other |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Injunction Hearing (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation/TRO Molina, Rosendo Unserved Ajala, Chitra Unserved Nanto, Belighan Darack Served 04/17/2023 Shihabuddin, Zahra Served 04/17/2023 | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Request | |
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event | Citation/TRO Molina, Rosendo Unserved Ajala, Chitra Unserved Nanto, Belighan Darack Unserved Shihabuddin, Zahra Unserved | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order Civil (OCA) | |
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judicial Docket Entry | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Original Petition (1-10 Plaintiffs) (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.