Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Ovation Services, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Gillian Foley-Coates, against Newrez, Llc, Mugubi, Lillian A., Mugubi, Dan Elisha, K. Hovnanian American Mortgage, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryContract - Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Mugubi, Dan Elisha Served 09/03/2021 Mugubi, Lillian A. Unserved NewRez, LLC Served 09/02/2021 K. Hovnanian American Mortgage, LLC Served 09/02/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Request | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | Original Petition (1-10 Plaintiffs) (OCA) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.