Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Yolo, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Mcneally, Derrick Donny, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 01, 2009 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Cycle Time9 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 08, 2009 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jun 1 2009 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Summons and Complaint DCSS DCSS (Non-Paternity) - Judgment/Order - Dispo Date: 06/01/2009- Disposition Type:Judgment/Order; MannerBefore Hearing |
|
June 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Statement 931130-Statement Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service STATEMENT [931130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.