Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Countryplace Master Community Association, Inc., filed a(n) Other Civil case represented by J. C. Jamison, against Farris, Jeanie, Farris, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts with Patrick E. Sebesta presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePatrick E. Sebesta Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 25, 2021 |
CategoryOther Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (11:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Proposed | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Default Judgment (9:00 AM) (Judicial Officer Sebesta, Patrick) | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
October 04, 2021 | Docket Event | Service Returned | |
September 28, 2021 | Docket Event | Correspondence | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Citation Farris, Charles Served 10/02/2021 Farris, Jeanie Served 10/11/2021 | |
August 25, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.