Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Roach, Sarah, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Roach, John N., in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2021 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
April 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) | |
April 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
April 01, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Exhibit | |
January 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Statement | |
January 26, 2021 | Docket Event | Temporary Orders Hearing (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.