Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Grota, Ashley Ann, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Grota, James Richard, Ii, in the jurisdiction of Brazoria County, TX, . Brazoria County, TX Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2022 |
CategoryMarriage - Divorce Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationBrazoria County, TX |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeAgreed Judgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Exhibit List | |
February 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 01/12/2022 Reset by Court to 01/24/2022 01/24/2022 Reset by Court to 02/07/2022 02/07/2022 Reset by Court to 02/28/2022 | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order (9:30 AM) (Judicial Officer Hufstetler, K. Randall) 01/12/2022 Reset by Court to 01/24/2022 01/24/2022 Reset by Court to 02/07/2022 | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Docket Entry |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.